Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brooks, Ernest J., filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Dignity Health, Dr. M. Ahmed, Dr. R. Young, represented by Donahue, Craig R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management187 days |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2014 |
Category25-Cv Professional Negligence - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial1090 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1045 days |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 04, 2015Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2015Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: October 05, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: October 27, 2016Motion for Leave
Date: December 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 8 days Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 8 days Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference J/T: 09/18/17 T/E: 8 days Jury requested by all parties Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference J/T: 09/18/17 T/E: 8 days Jury requested by all parties Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
August 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference T/E 8 days CFM 9-08-17 / TD 9-18-17 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference T/E 8 days CFM 9-08-17 / TD 9-18-17 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
August 15, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
August 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal |
|
July 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Settlement - Conditional NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.