Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
De La Cruz, Jesusa, Cantorna, Russell, Dial, Lisa, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Guthrie, Lori J, against Mcmillin Management Services Lp, Bakersfield Residential Builders L.P., Corky Mcmillin Construction Services, Inc., Mcmillin Emerald Estates, Llc, Mcmillin Crystal Ranch, Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management189 days |
Filing DateMay 30, 2014 |
Category10-Cv Construction Defect - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Case Cycle Time228 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Calendar Notes: IF STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS SIGNED - DATE TO BE VACATED. IF STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS SIGNED - DATE TO BE VACATED. Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Calendar Notes: IF STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS SIGNED - DATE TO BE VACATED. IF STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS SIGNED - DATE TO BE VACATED. Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
December 29, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated CASE CONSOLIDATED ~ calid=2734855 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4145, CourtDate:01/13/2015, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CCM, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:12/12/2014 11:47:40 AM |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated CASE CONSOLIDATED ~ calid=2734855 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4145, CourtDate:01/13/2015, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CCM, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:12/12/2014 11:47:40 AM |
|
December 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Case Consolidated - Child Case THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER CV282149 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER CV280425, CASE CV280425 BEING THE LEAD CASE , PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED IN CASE CV280425 |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated - Child Case THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER CV282149 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER CV280425, CASE CV280425 BEING THE LEAD CASE , PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED IN CASE CV280425 |
|
December 12, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1430 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LORI J GUTHRIE APPEARS ON BEHALF OF ALL NAMED PLAINTIFFS. VIA COURT CALL. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL INFORM COURT THAT A STIPULATION HAS BEEN SENT TO THE COURT FOR SIGNATURE REGARDING CONSOLIDATING S-1500-CV-282149-LHB WITH S-1500-CV-280425-DRL WITH CV-280245 BEING THE LEAD CASE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 1/13/2015 AT 8:15 AM IN DIV/DEPT 17 FOR HEARING ON CAL: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE THE HON. LORNA H BRUMFIELD OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. IF STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS SIGNED PRIOR TO NEXT COURT DATE, DATE TO BE VACATED. COUNSEL FOR LISA DIAL (PL-1) TO GIVE NOTICE. |
|
December 12, 2014 | Hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
December 12, 2014 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: LORI J GUTHRIE APPEARS ON BEHALF OF ALL NAMED PLAINTIFFS. VIA COURT CALL. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL INFORM COURT THAT A STIPULATION HAS BEEN SENT TO THE COURT FOR SIGNATURE REGARDING CONSOLIDATING S-1500-CV-282149-LHB WITH S-1500-CV-280425-DRL WITH CV-280245 BEING THE LEAD CASE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 1/13/2015 AT 8:15 AM IN DIV/DEPT 17 FOR HEARING ON CAL: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE THE HON. LORNA H BRUMFIELD OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. IF STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS SIGNED PRIOR TO NEXT COURT DATE, DATE TO BE VACATED. COUNSEL FOR LISA DIAL (PL-1) TO GIVE NOTICE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.