Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Mitchell, John T, against Williams, Juanas B., American A-Plus Security, Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Linda S Etienne presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2014 |
Category07-Cv Business Tort - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Abstract Issued Document Image |
|
December 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: IN RE: CRC 3.110 IN RE: CRC 3.110 Judge: Non, Fast Track |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: IN RE: CRC 3.110 IN RE: CRC 3.110 Judge: Non, Fast Track |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued Document Image |
|
December 01, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2686700 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4003, CourtDate:12/18/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:OSC, Judge:NFT, SystemDate:10/16/2014 10:01:05 AM |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2686700 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4003, CourtDate:12/18/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:OSC, Judge:NFT, SystemDate:10/16/2014 10:01:05 AM |
|
November 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT **ETIENNE** |
|
November 25, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION; FILED BY PLAINTIFF, HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 11/13/2014. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). *************************************************************************************** JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED AS PRAYED. THE PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN SIGNED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION; FILED BY PLAINTIFF, HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 11/13/2014. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). *************************************************************************************** JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS. JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED AS PRAYED. THE PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN SIGNED. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT **ETIENNE** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.