Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cleveland, Bowe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Assistant Principal Rona Angelo, Principal Marilyn Brown, Superintendent William Mcdermott, Taft Union High School District, represented by Herr, Leonard C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLampe, David R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial524 days |
Last RefreshedJune 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1051 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2269 days |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: June 11, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: November 02, 2015Motion to Stay (Pre-Disposition)
Date: October 05, 2015Motion to Consolidate
Date: September 29, 2015Demurrer
Date: October 04, 2016Motion to Consolidate
Date: January 29, 2019Demurrer
Date: November 18, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: March 04, 2016Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 11, 2016Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: August 16, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: March 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Ack of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Service/Courtesy Copy Received Appellant's Opening Brief |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service/Courtesy Copy Received Appellant's Opening Brief |
|
January 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Receipt for Records Returned Received From: LEONARD C. HERR |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Records Returned Received From: LEONARD C. HERR |
|
January 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Withdrawal From Trust Fund Processed trust refunds as follows: $2,282.56 & $1,323.42 to Virginia Greene, $5,191.80 to Herr Pedersen & Berglund, and $6,565.30 to Rodriguez & Associates (General Account). Completed on 01/17/20. CR |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal From Trust Fund Processed trust refunds as follows: $2,282.56 & $1,323.42 to Virginia Greene, $5,191.80 to Herr Pedersen & Berglund, and $6,565.30 to Rodriguez & Associates (General Account). Completed on 01/17/20. CR |
|
January 16, 2020 | Hearing | Original Record on Appeal (Vol. >20) | |
January 16, 2020 | Hearing | Record on Appeal Mailed to Fifth District Court of Appeal | |
January 16, 2020 | Hearing | Receipt for Records Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.