Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dureza, M.D., Catalino, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Miller, Nathan S, against Johnson, Michael, Mercy Hospital, Spain, Richard, Neuro Application Services, Corp., represented by Snyder, Bradley A, Margulies, David L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2013 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial761 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions254 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1204 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal CRC 3.1385 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal CRC 3.1385 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With prejudice as to complaint |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With prejudice as to complaint |
|
June 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Jury Trial trial date re-set from 2/1/16 to 6/13/16 t/e 5 to 7 days defense jury/plaintiff waived Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial trial date re-set from 2/1/16 to 6/13/16 t/e 5 to 7 days defense jury/plaintiff waived Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference j/y 6/13/16 re-set from 2/1/16 by stip. Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference j/y 6/13/16 re-set from 2/1/16 by stip. Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
May 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Friedman, Gary T. |
|
May 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice of Settlement Unconditional Notice of Settlement of Entire Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.