Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
UNION BANK VS SINGH
A 06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 28, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Chapin, Sidney P.;Category
06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Bankruptcy
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2013 | hearing |
Abstract Issued RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL |
|
September 13, 2013 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 9/13/2013. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CASE IS STAYED IN IT'S ENTIRETY PURSUANT TO 11 USC 362 SUBJECT TO PLAINTIFFS' OBTAINING RELIEF IN BANKRUPTCY COURT FROM STAY, MOVING TO SEVER PARTIES OR DISMISSING THIS ACTION. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
September 13, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY NATHAN R. BERKELEY, ESQ |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY NATHAN R. BERKELEY, ESQ |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 11 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 9/13/2013. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CASE IS STAYED IN IT'S ENTIRETY PURSUANT TO 11 USC 362 SUBJECT TO PLAINTIFFS' OBTAINING RELIEF IN BANKRUPTCY COURT FROM STAY, MOVING TO SEVER PARTIES OR DISMISSING THIS ACTION. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
September 05, 2013 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ABSTRACT RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN / PREMATURE CANNOT FILE UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER JUDGMENT |
|
September 05, 2013 | hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN |
|
September 05, 2013 | hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for UNION BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATIO... (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY, check no(s) 7904. Receipt #736950 for amount of $50.00. |
|
September 05, 2013 | hearing |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for UNION BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATIO... (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY, check no(s) 7904. Receipt #736950 for amount of $50.00. |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for UNION BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATIO... (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY, check no(s) 7904. Receipt #736950 for amount of $50.00. |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ABSTRACT RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL BIN / PREMATURE CANNOT FILE UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER JUDGMENT |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for UNION BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATIO... (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY, check no(s) 7904. Receipt #736950 for amount of $50.00. |
|
August 27, 2013 | hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
August 20, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment FILED BY: LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment FILED BY: LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY |
|
August 13, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated JUDGMENT SIGNED/ENTERED ~ calid=2178467 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:08/27/2013, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:4/30/2013 2:22:11 PM |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated JUDGMENT SIGNED/ENTERED ~ calid=2178467 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:08/27/2013, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:4/30/2013 2:22:11 PM |
|
August 08, 2013 | hearing |
Judgment by Default by Court AS TO SARPAL SINGH AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SARPAL SINGH BATHH; SIGNED BY David R Lampe |
|
August 08, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration and Order ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL; SIGNED BY David R Lampe |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Court AS TO SARPAL SINGH AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SARPAL SINGH BATHH; SIGNED BY David R Lampe |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL; SIGNED BY David R Lampe |
|
June 18, 2013 | hearing |
Declaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack Document Image |
|
June 18, 2013 | hearing |
Summary of Issues BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE |
|
June 18, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment AS TO SARPAL SINGH, AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SARPAL SINGH BATHH |
|
June 18, 2013 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) W/O PREJUDICE AS TO DOES |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment AS TO SARPAL SINGH, AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SARPAL SINGH BATHH |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) W/O PREJUDICE AS TO DOES |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack Document Image |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summary of Issues BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE |
|
June 13, 2013 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
May 13, 2013 | hearing |
Request to Enter Default AS TO SARPAL SINGH, AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SARPAL SINGH BATHH |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default AS TO SARPAL SINGH, AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SARPAL SINGH BATHH |
|
May 07, 2013 | hearing |
Proof of Service OF NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATES |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service OF NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATES |
|
April 30, 2013 | hearing |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 8/27/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 8/27/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 8/27/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE David R Lampe FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE David R Lampe ON 8/27/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. |
|
April 11, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated 6/13/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2178462 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:06/13/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:2/28/2013 12:12:23 PM |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated 6/13/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2178462 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:06/13/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:2/28/2013 12:12:23 PM |
|
April 10, 2013 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint AS TO SARPAL SINGH SERVED 3/27/13 BY SUBSTITUTE |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint AS TO SARPAL SINGH SERVED 3/27/13 BY SUBSTITUTE |
|
March 01, 2013 | hearing |
800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) Amount of $435.00 for UNION BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATIO... (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY, check no(s) 7666. Receipt #704864 for amount of $435.00. |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) Amount of $435.00 for UNION BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATIO... (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF DAVID W. BRODY, check no(s) 7666. Receipt #704864 for amount of $435.00. |
|
February 28, 2013 | hearing |
Notice of Hearing ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
February 28, 2013 | hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL NETWORK |
|
February 28, 2013 | hearing |
Complaint - Fast Track FILED AS DAVID W. BRODY CMC 8/27/13 800AM |
|
February 28, 2013 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) CONTRACT 06 |
|
February 28, 2013 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 13, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 13, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) CONTRACT 06 |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 13, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 13, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Fast Track FILED AS DAVID W. BRODY CMC 8/27/13 800AM |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed RETURNED VIA FIRST LEGAL NETWORK |