Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Judith Smoot, As Trustee Of The Luise Smoot Family Trust, Macpherson Oil Company, National Petroleum Associates, National Petroleum Associates, Macpherson Oil Company, A California Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Cooper, Brett, Judith Smoot, As Trustee Of The Anna Luise Smoot Family Trust, Smoot, Judith, represented by Draper, Jack A, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLampe, David R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2012 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial1035 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1377 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1889 days |
Ruling
Date: July 27, 2015Motion to Consolidate
Date: July 06, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: July 21, 2017Demurrer
Date: October 14, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: October 14, 2015Demurrer
Date: October 14, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: April 01, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: October 14, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: November 16, 2017Motion for Leave
Date: November 30, 2017Motion to Strike
Date: April 19, 2016Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 17, 2016Demurrer
Date: April 19, 2016Motion to Stay (Pre-Disposition)
Date: December 10, 2015Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 23, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: April 01, 2016Demurrer
Date: April 01, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: August 10, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: August 10, 2016Demurrer
Date: August 10, 2016Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: December 12, 2017Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: July 29, 2016Demurrer
Date: August 10, 2016Demurrer
Date: August 17, 2016Motion to Strike
Date: August 17, 2016Motion for Sanctions (Pre-Disposition)
Date: September 30, 2016Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)
Date: December 21, 2016Demurrer
Date: April 11, 2017Ruling
Date: June 20, 2017Motion for Leave
Date: February 06, 2017Demurrer
Date: October 04, 2017Demurrer
Date: October 23, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: January 17, 2018Demurrer
Date: January 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial T/E 16-20 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Court Trial T/E 16-20 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference COURT TRIAL 06/25/18; T/E 16-20 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
June 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference COURT TRIAL 06/25/18; T/E 16-20 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference COURT TRIAL 06/25/18; T/E 16-20 DAYS; DEPT. 11 Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
May 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference COURT TRIAL 06/25/18; T/E 16-20 DAYS; DEPT. 11 Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 1/22/2018 PLAINTIFF MACPHERSON OIL COMPANY AND NATIONAL PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR RESCISSION IN SMOOT'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON JANUARY 9, 2014 ResID: 28926 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 1/22/2018 PLAINTIFF MACPHERSON OIL COMPANY AND NATIONAL PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR RESCISSION IN SMOOT'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON JANUARY 9, 2014 ResID: 28926 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Adjudication 1/12/2018 PLAINTIFF MACPHERSON OIL COMPANY AND NATIONAL PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES MOTION OF MACPHERSON OIL COMPANY AND NATIONAL PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO SMOOT'S CLAIMS CONCERNING PIECEMEAL LEASE TERMINATION AND RELATED RATIFICATION DEFENSE ResID: 28843 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
April 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion for Summary Adjudication 1/12/2018 PLAINTIFF MACPHERSON OIL COMPANY AND NATIONAL PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES MOTION OF MACPHERSON OIL COMPANY AND NATIONAL PETROLEUM ASSOCIATES FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO SMOOT'S CLAIMS CONCERNING PIECEMEAL LEASE TERMINATION AND RELATED RATIFICATION DEFENSE ResID: 28843 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.