Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bivens, Joyce Anne, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Andrews, Brian Keith, against Save Mart Supermarkets, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time263 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2012 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385CONT'D FROM 10/31/11; 11/30/2011 PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385CONT'D FROM 10/31/11; 11/30/2011 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385CONT'D FROM 10/31/11; 11/30/2011 PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385CONT'D FROM 10/31/11; 11/30/2011 Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
January 10, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated REQUEST FOR DISMSSAL ENTERED ~ calid=1775182 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:01/17/2012, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:9, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DRL, Deputy:juliew, SystemDate:12/1/2011 10:33:15 AM |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated REQUEST FOR DISMSSAL ENTERED ~ calid=1775182 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:01/17/2012, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:9, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DRL, Deputy:juliew, SystemDate:12/1/2011 10:33:15 AM |
|
December 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Returned After Conditional Settlement DY165556 Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
December 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY BRIAN KEITH ANDREWS ESQ. |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY BRIAN KEITH ANDREWS ESQ. |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Returned After Conditional Settlement DY165556 Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
November 30, 2011 | Hearing |
NP4170 PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385. Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC, RULE 3.1385. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR BRIAN KEITH ANDREWS ON BEHALF OF JOYCE ANNE BIVENS (PL-1). *************************************************************************************** CASE TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 4 FOR HEARING; DEPARTMENT 7 IS DARK. CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT IMPOSES MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE SUM OF $150.00 AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S ORDERS AND FAILURE TO SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS. SANCTIONS TO BE PAID WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS FROM NOTICE OF THIS MINUTE ORDER ISSUED BY THE COURT CLERK. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL IS CONTINUED TO 01/17/2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 7. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO COUNSEL AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING THIS DATE. |
|
November 30, 2011 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1385 CONT. FROM 10-31-11 TRANSFERRED TO DEPT 4; DEPT 7 IS DARK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.