Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thompson, Nicholas, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Thompson, Francis Lutie, against Directv, represented by Shah, Raagini R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
Category13-Cv Defamation - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2011 | Hearing | Notice of Ruling | |
October 26, 2011 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
October 18, 2011 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated TRANSFERRED TO LA CTY ~ calid=1580986 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4148, CourtDate:10/26/2011, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:annamariej, SystemDate:5/9/2011 8:43:31 AM |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated TRANSFERRED TO LA CTY ~ calid=1580986 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4148, CourtDate:10/26/2011, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:annamariej, SystemDate:5/9/2011 8:43:31 AM |
|
October 13, 2011 | Hearing |
Order GRANTING DEFENDANT DIRECTV INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO PROPER COURT MATTER TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, CALIFORNIA IT IS SO ORDERED. ***DAVID R LAMPE*** |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING DEFENDANT DIRECTV INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO PROPER COURT MATTER TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, CALIFORNIA IT IS SO ORDERED. ***DAVID R LAMPE*** |
|
October 12, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1580 Department: 7 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE TO PROPER COURT FILED BY DEFENDANT. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NICHOLAS THOMPSON (PL-1) APPEARS BY FRANCIS LUTIE THOMPSON. DIRECTV (DE-1) APPEARS BY RAAGINI R SHAH. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: NO OBJECTION FILED WITH COURT. MOTION GRANTED. ORDER SUBMITTED TO COURT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
October 12, 2011 | Hearing |
4064 Motion for Change of Venue Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: 09/09/11 DEFENDANT; TO PROPER COURT |
|
October 12, 2011 | Hearing |
Motion for Change of Venue 09/09/11 DEFENDANT; TO PROPER COURT Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Change of Venue 09/09/11 DEFENDANT; TO PROPER COURT Judge: Lampe, David R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.