Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perez, Cassie, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Roberson, Krachele, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time19 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1620 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
May 18, 2011 | Hearing |
4072 OSC/Petition re: Harassment Hearing Entered. |
|
May 18, 2011 | Hearing |
Petition for Harassment
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1620 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
4072 OSC/Petition re: Harassment Hearing Entered. |
|
May 03, 2011 | Hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 18 |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 18 |
|
May 02, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) TEMPORARY ORDERS ISSUED 100 YARD STAY ORDERS HEARING: MAY 18, 2011 @ 830AM D-14 SD SCHUETT |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CH) TEMPORARY ORDERS ISSUED 100 YARD STAY ORDERS HEARING: MAY 18, 2011 @ 830AM D-14 SD SCHUETT |
|
April 29, 2011 | Hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted IT IS ORDEREDD SD SCHUETT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.