Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pham, Patricia, filed a(n) 42-Cv Other Complaint - Civil Unlimited case against Green Valley Vegetable Incorporated, A California Corporation, Vo, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
Category42-Cv Other Complaint - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time433 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: THE LAW OFFICE OF KATHRYN M FOX 1430 TRUXTUN AVE SUITE 720 BAKERSFIELD CA 93301 RE: [~cs_nm_title] Case No. [~Master_File.cs_no_ct_typ]-[~Master_File.cs_no_loc]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_cat]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_no], [~Master_File.judge_code] NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS __ The attached ___________________________________ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:[~cs_nm_title] Case No. [~Master_File.cs_no_ct_typ]-[~Master_File.cs_no_loc]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_cat]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_no], [~Master_File.judge_code] __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: THE LAW OFFICE OF KATHRYN M FOX 1430 TRUXTUN AVE SUITE 720 BAKERSFIELD CA 93301 RE: PHAM VS VO Case No. S-1500-CV-273450, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS __ The attached ___________________________________ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:PHAM VS VO Case No. S-1500-CV-273450, DRL __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: THE LAW OFFICE OF KATHRYN M FOX 1430 TRUXTUN AVE SUITE 720 BAKERSFIELD CA 93301 RE: [~cs_nm_title] Case No. [~Master_File.cs_no_ct_typ]-[~Master_File.cs_no_loc]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_cat]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_no], [~Master_File.judge_code] NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS __ The attached ___________________________________ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:[~cs_nm_title] Case No. [~Master_File.cs_no_ct_typ]-[~Master_File.cs_no_loc]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_cat]-[~Master_File.cs_no_cs_no], [~Master_File.judge_code] __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: THE LAW OFFICE OF KATHRYN M FOX 1430 TRUXTUN AVE SUITE 720 BAKERSFIELD CA 93301 RE: PHAM VS VO Case No. S-1500-CV-273450, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS __ The attached ___________________________________ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:PHAM VS VO Case No. S-1500-CV-273450, DRL __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. |
|
April 24, 2012 | Hearing |
172D Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Amount of $40.00 for VO, DANIEL (DE-1). Received from AMERICAN LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICE, check no(s) 8775. Receipt #651009 for amount of $40.00. |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
172D Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) Amount of $40.00 for VO, DANIEL (DE-1). Received from AMERICAN LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICE, check no(s) 8775. Receipt #651009 for amount of $40.00. |
|
October 26, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
October 06, 2011 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF PATRICIA PHAM FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH C.R.C. RULE 3.110 AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 8-4-11 - CASE APPEARS TO BE ABANDONED. |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF PATRICIA PHAM FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH C.R.C. RULE 3.110 AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 8-4-11 - CASE APPEARS TO BE ABANDONED. |
|
September 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 9/6/2011, in Department 7, before the Honorable DAVID R LAMPE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DAVID R LAMPE Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 9/6/2011, in Department 7, before the Honorable DAVID R LAMPE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DAVID R LAMPE Judge of the Superior Court |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 9/6/2011, in Department 7, before the Honorable DAVID R LAMPE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DAVID R LAMPE Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 9/6/2011, in Department 7, before the Honorable DAVID R LAMPE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DAVID R LAMPE Judge of the Superior Court |
|
September 07, 2011 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ~ calid=1572985 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:10/26/2011, Courtroom:7, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DRL, Deputy:ruthd, SystemDate:4/29/2011 10:53:34 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.