Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ortiz, Christopher, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Childers, Troy L, against Thomas, Luke Edward, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Katz, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatz, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2009 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time165 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2009 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: DIANE MEDINA/VOLUNTEER ATTORNEY GBLA NEW ATTORNEY: IN PRO PER |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: DIANE MEDINA/VOLUNTEER ATTORNEY GBLA NEW ATTORNEY: IN PRO PER |
|
August 07, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ON SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED 8/6/09: LINE 2C AND 2D ARE INCOMPLETE (VIA AMS) |
|
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ON SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED 8/6/09: LINE 2C AND 2D ARE INCOMPLETE (VIA AMS) |
|
June 10, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: TROY L CHILDERS ESQ RE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD IS A FAMILY LAW FORM; CIVIL CASES REQUIRE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FORM; COURT ADDRESS IS INCORRECT |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: TROY L CHILDERS ESQ RE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD IS A FAMILY LAW FORM; CIVIL CASES REQUIRE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FORM; COURT ADDRESS IS INCORRECT |
|
May 20, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT; HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 5/14/2009. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: PETITION RE HARASSMENT DENIED. THERE IS NO CLEAR AND CONVINCING EVIDENCE THAT DEFENDANT LUKE EDWARD THOMAS IS A THREAT TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER ORTIZ. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION. |
|
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT; HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 5/14/2009. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: PETITION RE HARASSMENT DENIED. THERE IS NO CLEAR AND CONVINCING EVIDENCE THAT DEFENDANT LUKE EDWARD THOMAS IS A THREAT TO PLAINTIFF CHRISTOPHER ORTIZ. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION. |
|
May 14, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1835 Department: 17 |
|
May 14, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1620 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: HARASSMENT. AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR THIS MINUTE ORDER AMENDED ON 5/22/2009 BY M. MILLER TO CORRECT ERROR IN COURT'S ORDERS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CHRISTOPHER ORTIZ (PL-1) APPEARS WITH TROY L CHILDERS ESQ. LUKE EDWARD THOMAS (DE-1) APPEARS WITH DIANE M MEDINA. *************************************************************************************** MATTER TO BE HEARD WITH RELATED CASE CV-266509. JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: AMANDA THOMAS. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT: KERN COUNTY SHERIFF DEPUTY JOSEPH MALLEY AND CHRISTINA ORTIZ. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF MAKES CLOSING ARGUMENTS. COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENSE MAKES CLOSING ARGUMENTS. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT AS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT ONLY. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS ISSUED DO NOT APPLY TO THE CHILDREN IN THESE MATTERS. DEFENDANT AND PLAINTIFF ORDERED TO REMAIN 50 YARDS AWAY FROM ANOTHER. PLAINTIFF IS PERMITTED TO CARRY HIS FIREARM FOR EMPLOYMENT PURPOSES ONLY. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO PREPARE RESTRAINING ORDER PENDING COURT'S RULING. EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF. CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. CAUSE STANDS SUBMITTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.