Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gonzales, Sonya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stiles, David V, against Kern High School District, A Public Entity Operating Vista West High School, represented by Robinson, Oliver U, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management168 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial502 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time502 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2008 | Hearing |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
4000 Jury Trial New Calendar |
|
June 06, 2008 | Hearing |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
4142 Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
June 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MICHAEL KELLAR, ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MICHAEL KELLAR, ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT |
|
May 29, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY DAVID V. STILES, ESQ |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY DAVID V. STILES, ESQ |
|
May 27, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1820 UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION: Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION: THE FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/6/2008 SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 6/16/2008 AT 9:00 IN DEPARTMENT 4 THE MORNING OF TRIAL. |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1820 UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION: Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION: THE FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/6/2008 SHALL BE CONTINUED TO 6/16/2008 AT 9:00 IN DEPARTMENT 4 THE MORNING OF TRIAL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.