Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ace Engineering Inc, filed a(n) 16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited case represented by Lauby, Kirk A, against Romagno Enterprises Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2006 |
Category16-Cv Fraud - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2007 | Hearing |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
|
October 24, 2007 | Hearing |
Letter Received LETTER FROM: RICHARD E NUSBAUM, ESQ DATE OF LETTER: 10/24/07 RE: REQUESTING DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION HEARING SET FOR 10/29/2007 OFF THE COURT'S CALENDAR |
|
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LETTER FROM: RICHARD E NUSBAUM, ESQ DATE OF LETTER: 10/24/07 RE: REQUESTING DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION HEARING SET FOR 10/29/2007 OFF THE COURT'S CALENDAR |
|
October 16, 2007 | Hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION WHO SERVED:BOB ROMAGNO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: OCTOBER 1, 2007 SERVICE FEES: $105.00 |
|
October 16, 2007 | Hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION WHO SERVED: GEORGE RAMAGNO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: OCTOBER 1, 2007 SERVICE FEES: $105.00 |
|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION WHO SERVED:BOB ROMAGNO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: OCTOBER 1, 2007 SERVICE FEES: $105.00 |
|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION WHO SERVED: GEORGE RAMAGNO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: OCTOBER 1, 2007 SERVICE FEES: $105.00 |
|
October 03, 2007 | Hearing |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for ACE ENGINEERING INC (PL-1). Received from AMS. Receipt #343961 for amount of $15.00. |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for ACE ENGINEERING INC (PL-1). Received from AMS. Receipt #343961 for amount of $15.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.