Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adams, Rhonda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Granger, George W, against Oser, Justine, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etcheverry, Louis P. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time390 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2007 | Hearing |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
December 21, 2006 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY GEORGE W GRANGER |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY GEORGE W GRANGER |
|
December 20, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1435 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: GEORGE W GRANGER APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RHONDA ADAMS (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 1/24/2007 AT 8:30 A.M., DEPARTMENT 15 REASON FOR THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: RE; STATUS/REVIEW (DISMISSAL). NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY BY PARTIES IF DISMISSAL FILED AND PROCESSED BY COURT. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. |
|
December 20, 2006 | Hearing |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
December 20, 2006 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference MATTER CONTINUED FROM 11/14/2006 RE: STATUS/REVIEW (DISMISSAL) Judge: Etcheverry, Louis P. |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
4145 Further Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1435 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: GEORGE W GRANGER APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT RHONDA ADAMS (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 1/24/2007 AT 8:30 A.M., DEPARTMENT 15 REASON FOR THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: RE; STATUS/REVIEW (DISMISSAL). NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY BY PARTIES IF DISMISSAL FILED AND PROCESSED BY COURT. FURTHER NOTICE WAIVED. |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference MATTER CONTINUED FROM 11/14/2006 RE: STATUS/REVIEW (DISMISSAL) Judge: Etcheverry, Louis P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.