Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johns, Vickie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nichols, Steve W, against Goldberg, Donald, Goldberg, Rica Fry, represented by Coe, Diane M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etcheverry, Louis P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtcheverry, Louis P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time504 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2007 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
March 20, 2007 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
March 02, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY STEVE W. NICHOLS, ESQ. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 5/16/2007. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 5/17/2007 AT 830AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/2/2007 VACATED. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/23/2007 VACATED. JURY TRIAL ON 4/2/2007 VACATED. |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY STEVE W. NICHOLS, ESQ. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 5/16/2007. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 5/17/2007 AT 830AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/2/2007 VACATED. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/23/2007 VACATED. JURY TRIAL ON 4/2/2007 VACATED. |
|
March 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice of Settlement-Rule 225 FILED BY STEVE W. NICHOLS, ESQ. |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement-Rule 225 FILED BY STEVE W. NICHOLS, ESQ. |
|
January 30, 2007 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for JOHNS, VICKIE (PL-1). Received from THE LAW OFFICE OF YOUNG & NICHOLS, check no(s) 10262. Receipt #292115 for amount of $20.00. |
|
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for JOHNS, VICKIE (PL-1). Received from THE LAW OFFICE OF YOUNG & NICHOLS, check no(s) 10262. Receipt #292115 for amount of $20.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.