Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lea, Michael R, against Wood, Andrew Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2004 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2005 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY MARK R NIVINSKUS FOR PLAINTIFF SENT BACK THROUGH ACS |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY MARK R NIVINSKUS FOR PLAINTIFF SENT BACK THROUGH ACS |
|
December 07, 2004 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) DEFENDANT KENT WOOD IS DISMISSED FROM COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILE DBY MARK R NIVINSKUS, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF |
|
December 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) DEFENDANT KENT WOOD IS DISMISSED FROM COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILE DBY MARK R NIVINSKUS, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF |
|
November 29, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY DEFENDANT KENT WOOD |
|
November 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY DEFENDANT KENT WOOD |
|
November 16, 2004 | Hearing |
NP1415 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONSE TO CORRESPONDENCE DATED RESPONSE TO CORRESPONDENCE DATED 11/5/2004 FROM KENT WOOD, DEFENDANT IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER. ************************************************************************************************** NEED TO FILE NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON APPROVED FORM BLANK FORM PROVIDED. |
|
November 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
NP1415 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONSE TO CORRESPONDENCE DATED RESPONSE TO CORRESPONDENCE DATED 11/5/2004 FROM KENT WOOD, DEFENDANT IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER. ************************************************************************************************** NEED TO FILE NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON APPROVED FORM BLANK FORM PROVIDED. |
|
November 05, 2004 | Hearing |
Letter Received LETTER FROM: KENT L WOOD DATE OF LETTER: NOT PROVIDED DATE RECEIVED: 11/5/04 RE: INFORMATION TO ENSURE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY DOES NOT ATTEMP TO ENTER A DEFAULT WITHOUT THE COURTT BEING AWARE OF PROTECTION UNDER BANKRUPTCY FROM THIS SUIT. |
|
November 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LETTER FROM: KENT L WOOD DATE OF LETTER: NOT PROVIDED DATE RECEIVED: 11/5/04 RE: INFORMATION TO ENSURE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY DOES NOT ATTEMP TO ENTER A DEFAULT WITHOUT THE COURTT BEING AWARE OF PROTECTION UNDER BANKRUPTCY FROM THIS SUIT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.