Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hunter, Nagea, filed a(n) 24-Cv Product Liability - Civil Unlimited case represented by Stiles, David V, against Bloomfield Coffee Equipment, Canteen Of Bakersfield, represented by Frasher, Marshall C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Anspach, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2005 |
Category24-Cv Product Liability - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2005 | Hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
December 15, 2004 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 23, 2004 | Hearing |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
|
November 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
|
November 15, 2004 | Hearing |
801E Pmt: First Appearance Unlimited Civil EFF 1/1/04 Amount of $286.20 for CANTEEN OF BAKERSFIELD (DE-1). Received from ALLSTATE INS., check no(s) 028445058. Receipt #133316 for amount of $286.20. |
|
November 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
801E Pmt: First Appearance Unlimited Civil EFF 1/1/04 Amount of $286.20 for CANTEEN OF BAKERSFIELD (DE-1). Received from ALLSTATE INS., check no(s) 028445058. Receipt #133316 for amount of $286.20. |
|
November 08, 2004 | Hearing |
Demand for Jury FILED BY MARSHALL FRASHER, ATTY FOR DEF. |
|
November 08, 2004 | Hearing |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY MARSHALL FRASHER, ATTY FOR DEF. SASE NOT PROVIDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.