Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alexander, Matt, filed a(n) 02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited case represented by Trinnaman, Jay G, against California City City Council, City Of California City, Dickerson, L. Wayne, represented by Nave, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2004 |
Category02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time394 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2005 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 15, 2005 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS DENIED & PETITIONER TAKES NOTHING FROM RESPONDENTS, INCLUDING ATTORNEY FEES. COSTS ARE AWARDED TO RESPONDENTS. ETIENNE* |
|
September 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS DENIED & PETITIONER TAKES NOTHING FROM RESPONDENTS, INCLUDING ATTORNEY FEES. COSTS ARE AWARDED TO RESPONDENTS. ETIENNE* |
|
August 18, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1820 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. ATTACHED HEREWITH IS COURT'S STATEMENT OF DECISION. |
|
August 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. ATTACHED HEREWITH IS COURT'S STATEMENT OF DECISION. |
|
August 17, 2005 | Hearing |
Request/Statement of Decision STATEMENT OF DECISION PREPARED BY THE COURT |
|
August 17, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: Petition for writ of mandamus is denied. Petitioner's request for attorney's fees pursuant to Govt. Code 800 is likewise denied. Counsel for Respondent to submit an order accordingly. THE DECISION IS MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES. |
|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request/Statement of Decision STATEMENT OF DECISION PREPARED BY THE COURT |
|
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: Petition for writ of mandamus is denied. Petitioner's request for attorney's fees pursuant to Govt. Code 800 is likewise denied. Counsel for Respondent to submit an order accordingly. THE DECISION IS MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES. |
|
July 21, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1525 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROBIN SERGY APPEARS FOR JAY G TRINNAMAN. ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA CITY CITY COUNCIL (DE-1) APPEARS BY SCOTT NAVE. CITY OF CALIFORNIA CITY (DE-2) APPEARS BY SCOTT NAVE. L. WAYNE DICKERSON (DE-3) APPEARS BY SCOTT NAVE. MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. CAUSE STANDS SUBMITTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.