Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tejon Ranchcorp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kinney, J Nile, against Standing Bear Petroleum, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2003 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2005 | Hearing |
6053 Bond Exonerated #A15-2084031, AS TO ROBERT RICKETTS |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
6053 Bond Exonerated #A15-2084031, AS TO ROBERT RICKETTS |
|
March 22, 2005 | Hearing |
Certificate of Progress FILED BY J NILE KINNEY ON BEHALF OF PLTF |
|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Progress FILED BY J NILE KINNEY ON BEHALF OF PLTF |
|
January 07, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 12/23/2004 BY J NILE KINNEY ************************************************************************************************** PROCEEDINGS STAYED DUE TO BANKRUPTCY. (AS TO DEFENDANT STANDING BEAR PETROLEUM) PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE FURTHER CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS BY 3/22/2005 RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY. |
|
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 12/23/2004 BY J NILE KINNEY ************************************************************************************************** PROCEEDINGS STAYED DUE TO BANKRUPTCY. (AS TO DEFENDANT STANDING BEAR PETROLEUM) PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE FURTHER CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS BY 3/22/2005 RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY. |
|
December 23, 2004 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding (After Trial) FILED BY J NILE KENNY ON BEHALF OF PLTF |
|
December 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding (After Trial) FILED BY J NILE KENNY ON BEHALF OF PLTF |
|
December 22, 2004 | Hearing |
NP1095 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO EXAM/BENCH WARRANT RE: ROBERT RICKETTS, PRESIDENT AND AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR STANDING BEAR PETROLEUM CO. INC. DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. J NILE KINNEY APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT TEJON RANCHCORP (PL-1). BOND NUMBER A15-2084031 EXONERATED. MATTER DROPPED AT THIS TIME. 9:15 A.M. DEBITOR, ROBERT RICKETTS APPEARS LATE. DEFENDANT ADVISED OF EARLIER PROCEEDINGS |
|
December 22, 2004 | Hearing |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.