Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Farin, Rey, Farin, Estrella, Abiva, Jason, Farin, Jonathan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Haus, Julia E, against Fajard, Arthur Pinon, Ugarte, Violeta, Keydeniers, Louise Annette, Alvarado, Juan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 1999 |
CategoryPersonal Injury-Motor Vehicle-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 1999 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference
Judge: Wallace, Arthur E |
|
March 16, 1999 | Hearing |
Case Consolidated LEAD NUMBER 237555 AEW, W/237577 AEW, 237616 RA, 237719 AEW, 237735 AEW |
|
March 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated LEAD NUMBER 237555 AEW, W/237577 AEW, 237616 RA, 237719 AEW, 237735 AEW |
|
January 27, 1999 | Hearing |
290 ASM: Subsequent Pet - Probate Paid By: LAW OFFICE OF J |
|
January 27, 1999 | Docket Event |
290 ASM: Subsequent Pet - Probate Paid By: LAW OFFICE OF J |
|
January 26, 1999 | Hearing |
Summons Issued FOR THE PLTF |
|
January 26, 1999 | Hearing |
First Amended Complaint FOR THE PLTF BY JULIA HAUS ESQ |
|
January 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued FOR THE PLTF |
|
January 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint FOR THE PLTF BY JULIA HAUS ESQ |
|
December 18, 1998 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice $75.00 FEE REQUIRED FOR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.