Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Romero, Martha Theresa, County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) 43-Cm Civil Miscellaneous-Other Petition (Bcl) case against Romero, Eugene Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcKnight, Ralph L., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 1989 |
Category43-Cm Civil Miscellaneous-Other Petition (Bcl) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2006 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RE: C/S ARRS,DL REL RLM |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order RE: C/S ARRS,DL REL RLM |
|
September 06, 2006 | Hearing |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
September 06, 2006 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) RE: RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF LICENSE DENIAL. RELATED CASE 589503 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) RE: RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF LICENSE DENIAL. RELATED CASE 589503 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
August 29, 2006 | Hearing | Responsive Declaration | |
August 17, 2006 | Hearing |
Motion for Judicial Review of License Denial (DCSS) COURT DATE: 09/06/2006 COURT TIME: 08:30 AM COURT DEPT/DIV: F/300 |
|
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judicial Review of License Denial (DCSS) COURT DATE: 09/06/2006 COURT TIME: 08:30 AM COURT DEPT/DIV: F/300 |
|
November 15, 2004 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.