Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CARTWRIGHT JR. VS PORTER
A Small Claims - Conversion case was filed by Cartwright Jr., Henry, Iii, against Porter, Tosheka M., and Porter, Marcella, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 13, 2011
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Small Claims - Conversion
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
6 months
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2011 | hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/13/11. NOTICES MAILED 10/31/11. |
|
October 13, 2011 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 09/06/2011 The Court rules as follows: By minute order dated September 6, 2011, the Court requested plaintiff to submit by September 30, 2011 a declaration pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 116.540(f) in support of his claim. Having not received any declaration, and having considered the testimony of the defendants, the Court finds in favor of the defendants. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF. SMALL CLAIMS CLERK TO ATTACH RULING TO NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT ENTERED 10/13/11. NOTICES MAILED 10/31/11. |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 09/06/2011 The Court rules as follows: By minute order dated September 6, 2011, the Court requested plaintiff to submit by September 30, 2011 a declaration pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 116.540(f) in support of his claim. Having not received any declaration, and having considered the testimony of the defendants, the Court finds in favor of the defendants. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF. SMALL CLAIMS CLERK TO ATTACH RULING TO NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. |
|
September 06, 2011 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: REGARDING DECLARATION THE COURT IS REQUESTING THE PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT AN EVIDENTIARY DECLARATION OR DECLARATION ON THE MERITS OF THE CASE. THE DECLARATIONS ARE TO BE SUBMITTED NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2011 COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF ADDRESS AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: REGARDING DECLARATION THE COURT IS REQUESTING THE PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT AN EVIDENTIARY DECLARATION OR DECLARATION ON THE MERITS OF THE CASE. THE DECLARATIONS ARE TO BE SUBMITTED NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2011 COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF ADDRESS AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION |
|
September 01, 2011 | hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF-HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR III -CURRENTLY INCARCERATED MARCELLA PORTER III (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. TOSHEKA M. PORTER (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADINGS. REGARDING PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. |
|
September 01, 2011 | hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
September 01, 2011 | hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 01, 2011 | hearing |
Small Claims Trial Calendar Notes: REGARDING COURT TIME CHANGE FROM 9;30 A.M. TO 1:30 P.M. - NO TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PLAINTIFF. NO RESPONSE TO TELEPHONE CALL FOR DEFENDANT #1. TALKED WITH DEFENDANT #2 AND INFORMED HER OF TIME CHANGE. REGARDING COURT TIME CHANGE FROM 9;30 A.M. TO 1:30 P.M. - NO TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PLAINTIFF. NO RESPONSE TO TELEPHONE CALL FOR DEFENDANT #1. TALKED WITH DEFENDANT #2 AND INFORMED HER OF TIME CHANGE. Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF-HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR III -CURRENTLY INCARCERATED MARCELLA PORTER III (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. TOSHEKA M. PORTER (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADINGS. REGARDING PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial Calendar Notes: REGARDING COURT TIME CHANGE FROM 9;30 A.M. TO 1:30 P.M. - NO TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PLAINTIFF. NO RESPONSE TO TELEPHONE CALL FOR DEFENDANT #1. TALKED WITH DEFENDANT #2 AND INFORMED HER OF TIME CHANGE. REGARDING COURT TIME CHANGE FROM 9;30 A.M. TO 1:30 P.M. - NO TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PLAINTIFF. NO RESPONSE TO TELEPHONE CALL FOR DEFENDANT #1. TALKED WITH DEFENDANT #2 AND INFORMED HER OF TIME CHANGE. Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
August 31, 2011 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated NO PROOF OF SERVICE. ~ calid=1654503 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:09/01/2011, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:SDS, Deputy:ritaw, SystemDate:8/30/2011 9:51:29 AM |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated NO PROOF OF SERVICE. ~ calid=1654503 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:09/01/2011, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:SDS, Deputy:ritaw, SystemDate:8/30/2011 9:51:29 AM |
|
August 01, 2011 | hearing |
Certified Mail Unclaimed AS TO TOSHEKA M. PORTER |
|
August 01, 2011 | hearing |
Certified Mail Claimed AS TO HENRY CARTWRIGHT, JR. |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Claimed AS TO HENRY CARTWRIGHT, JR. |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Unclaimed AS TO TOSHEKA M. PORTER |
|
July 28, 2011 | hearing |
Certified Mail Claimed AS TO MARCELLA PORTER |
|
July 28, 2011 | hearing |
Small Claims Trial Calendar Notes: FEE WAIVER - PLAINTIFF IS A PRISONER FEE WAIVER - PLAINTIFF IS A PRISONER Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial Calendar Notes: FEE WAIVER - PLAINTIFF IS A PRISONER FEE WAIVER - PLAINTIFF IS A PRISONER Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Claimed AS TO MARCELLA PORTER |
|
July 25, 2011 | hearing |
Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant NEW COURT DATE OF 09/01/2011 |
|
July 25, 2011 | hearing |
Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail TOSHEKA PORTER/MARCELLA PORTER III/HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR. |
|
July 25, 2011 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated COURT POSTPONING HEARING TO EXECUTE SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS. ~ calid=1630584 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:07/28/2011, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:SDS, Deputy:marcs, SystemDate:6/29/2011 11:09:12 AM |
|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail TOSHEKA PORTER/MARCELLA PORTER III/HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR. |
|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated COURT POSTPONING HEARING TO EXECUTE SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS. ~ calid=1630584 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:07/28/2011, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:SDS, Deputy:marcs, SystemDate:6/29/2011 11:09:12 AM |
|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant NEW COURT DATE OF 09/01/2011 |
|
June 28, 2011 | hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
June 27, 2011 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated NO PROOF OF SERVICE ~ calid=1593475 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:06/28/2011, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:SDS, Deputy:marcs, SystemDate:5/20/2011 9:39:01 AM |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated NO PROOF OF SERVICE ~ calid=1593475 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:06/28/2011, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:SDS, Deputy:marcs, SystemDate:5/20/2011 9:39:01 AM |
|
June 24, 2011 | hearing |
Request for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing REQUEST GRANTED - NO COURT ORDER NECESSARY, PARTIES HAVE NOT BEEN SERVED. PLAINITFF'S CLAIM WITH NEW COURT DATE ATTACHED. ENDORSED COPIES MAILED |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing REQUEST GRANTED - NO COURT ORDER NECESSARY, PARTIES HAVE NOT BEEN SERVED. PLAINITFF'S CLAIM WITH NEW COURT DATE ATTACHED. ENDORSED COPIES MAILED |
|
May 20, 2011 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
May 20, 2011 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR. III |
|
May 20, 2011 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 321 |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted AS TO HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR. III |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 321 |
|
April 13, 2011 | hearing |
Request to Waive Court Fees FILED BY HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR. III |
|
April 13, 2011 | hearing |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant ENDORSED COPY MAILED |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant ENDORSED COPY MAILED |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees FILED BY HENRY CARTWRIGHT JR. III |