Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rio Bravo Phase Ii, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hudgins, James M., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time1554 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2015 | Hearing | Reporter's Transcript | |
October 03, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 18, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT ENTERED 7/18/2011. NOTICES MAILED 7/21/2011 |
|
July 18, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROBIN SAWYER APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. JAMES M. HUDGINS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** ROBIN SAWYWER, ROBERT AMBLE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. * CASE SETTLED* AS TO DEFENDANTS CLAIM: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT. |
|
July 18, 2011 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DEFENDANT'S CLAIM P.O.S. NOT TIMELY ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM |
|
July 18, 2011 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial DEFENDANT'S CLAIM P.O.S. NOT TIMELY ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial DEFENDANT'S CLAIM P.O.S. NOT TIMELY ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROBIN SAWYER APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. JAMES M. HUDGINS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** ROBIN SAWYWER, ROBERT AMBLE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. * CASE SETTLED* AS TO DEFENDANTS CLAIM: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT. |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT ENTERED 7/18/2011. NOTICES MAILED 7/21/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.