Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Veronica Morales, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Moreno, Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,500 Or Less |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time888 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 22, 2011 | Hearing |
Mediation Agreement Document Image |
|
June 22, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: VERONICA MORALES (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JESUS MORENO (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. STIPULATED AGREEMENT ON FILE HEREIN MADE AN ORDER OF THE COURT. MEDIATOR: MARSIOL GARCIA THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $200.00 ON 07/25/2011, PAY $200.00 ON 08/15/2011, PAY $300.00 ON 09/02/2011, PAY $300.00 ON 10/03/2011, PAY $243.00 ON 11/04/2011 UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $1243.00. NO GRACE PERIOD IN EVENT OF DEFAULT, PLAINTIFF MAY SEEK JUDGMENT BY FILING DECLARATION OF DEFAULT WITH COURT FOR $1243.00 PLUS COST $70.00 LESS CREDITS FOR PAYMENTS MADE. DECLARATION SUBMITTED SHALL INCLUDE PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT STATING THAT PAYMENTS HAVE NOT BEEN MADE. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH RIGHT IN THE EVENT OF DEFAULT OF STIPULATED AGREEMENT TO FILE DECLARATION TO HAVE PROCEEDINGS REINSTATED AND JUDGMENT ENTERED. |
|
June 22, 2011 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
June 22, 2011 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: VERONICA MORALES (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JESUS MORENO (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. STIPULATED AGREEMENT ON FILE HEREIN MADE AN ORDER OF THE COURT. MEDIATOR: MARSIOL GARCIA THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $200.00 ON 07/25/2011, PAY $200.00 ON 08/15/2011, PAY $300.00 ON 09/02/2011, PAY $300.00 ON 10/03/2011, PAY $243.00 ON 11/04/2011 UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $1243.00. NO GRACE PERIOD IN EVENT OF DEFAULT, PLAINTIFF MAY SEEK JUDGMENT BY FILING DECLARATION OF DEFAULT WITH COURT FOR $1243.00 PLUS COST $70.00 LESS CREDITS FOR PAYMENTS MADE. DECLARATION SUBMITTED SHALL INCLUDE PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT STATING THAT PAYMENTS HAVE NOT BEEN MADE. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH RIGHT IN THE EVENT OF DEFAULT OF STIPULATED AGREEMENT TO FILE DECLARATION TO HAVE PROCEEDINGS REINSTATED AND JUDGMENT ENTERED. |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement Document Image |
|
May 19, 2011 | Hearing |
Proof of Service AS TO JESUS MORENO. ENDORSED COPY IN TRI-STAR FOLDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.