Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bassey, Katie, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bowen, Joni, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 24, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,500 Or Less |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time973 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 06, 2012 | Hearing | Order for Destruction/Disposal Civil Exhibits | |
June 22, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Declaration INABILITY TO SERVE NOTICE TO KATIE BASSEY |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration INABILITY TO SERVE NOTICE TO KATIE BASSEY |
|
March 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 14, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: JONI BOWEN 20020 SEARS DR TEHACHAPI, CA 93561 RE: BASSEY VS BOWEN Case No. S-1500-CS-179787, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached DECLARATION OF PAYMENT DEBTOR REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HAS BEEN FILED (A COURTSEY COPY IS ATTACHED). ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. (SENT BY MAIL) Calendar Notes: TO: JONI BOWEN 20020 SEARS DR TEHACHAPI, CA 93561 RE: BASSEY VS BOWEN Case No. S-1500-CS-179787, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached DECLARATION OF PAYMENT DEBTOR REGARDING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HAS BEEN FILED (A COURTSEY COPY IS ATTACHED). ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.