Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patrick, Jerry D, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Phoenix Custom Homes, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time806 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 11, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Stay of Proceeding | |
April 01, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/18/2010 FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT; JUDGMENT: $1620.40; COSTS: $90.00; PLUS CANCELLED INVOICE #2-10-5532; MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 04/01/2010 |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/18/2010 FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT; JUDGMENT: $1620.40; COSTS: $90.00; PLUS CANCELLED INVOICE #2-10-5532; MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 04/01/2010 |
|
March 18, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JERRY D PATRICK (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1620.40 COSTS $90.00, PLUS CANCELLED INVOICE # 2-10-5532. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JERRY D PATRICK (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1620.40 COSTS $90.00, PLUS CANCELLED INVOICE # 2-10-5532. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
4150 Small Claims Trial Hearing Entered. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.