Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Daniel, Cornelius Ray, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cruz, Juan Antonio, Medina, Armida, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Katz, Steven M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - 5,001 To 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time1140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 03, 2009 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO CORNELIUS RAY DANIEL - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, FORWARD TO 510 E. 7TH ST, ROTAN, TX. 79545-3115. |
|
March 03, 2009 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO ARMIDA MEDINA - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, RETURNED TO SENDER, INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS, UNABLE TO RETURN. FORWARD TO CORRECT ADDRESS 1516 LANGSTON CT., BAKERSFIELD, CA. 93307. |
|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO ARMIDA MEDINA - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, RETURNED TO SENDER, INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS, UNABLE TO RETURN. FORWARD TO CORRECT ADDRESS 1516 LANGSTON CT., BAKERSFIELD, CA. 93307. |
|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO CORNELIUS RAY DANIEL - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, FORWARD TO 510 E. 7TH ST, ROTAN, TX. 79545-3115. |
|
February 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice of Change Name/Address 510 E 7TH - ROTAN TEXAS 79546 |
|
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change Name/Address 510 E 7TH - ROTAN TEXAS 79546 |
|
February 20, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
February 02, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.