Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sabie Acceptance, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lorta, Audelia Irene, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time1215 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
January 28, 2010 | Hearing |
4082 Debtors Examination Hearing Entered. |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
4082 Debtors Examination Hearing Entered. |
|
January 27, 2010 | Hearing |
Order to Appear Vacated 01/28/10; NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear Vacated 01/28/10; NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
|
December 10, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Appear for Exam JUDGMENT DEBTOR: AUDELIA IRENE LORTA; HEARING: 01/28/2010 AT 8:30 AM D-17 ***JUDGE LORNA H BRUMFIELD*** (RETURNED VIA PRO PER PICK-UP FOR ALLEN CRUZ, PER NOTE) |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear for Exam JUDGMENT DEBTOR: AUDELIA IRENE LORTA; HEARING: 01/28/2010 AT 8:30 AM D-17 ***JUDGE LORNA H BRUMFIELD*** (RETURNED VIA PRO PER PICK-UP FOR ALLEN CRUZ, PER NOTE) |
|
December 04, 2009 | Hearing |
858A Pmt: Small Claims Order for Examinatin GC 70617(A); Amount of $40.00 for SABIE ACCEPTANCE, INC. (PL-1). Received from COUNTER. Receipt #494605 for amount of $40.00. |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
858A Pmt: Small Claims Order for Examinatin GC 70617(A); Amount of $40.00 for SABIE ACCEPTANCE, INC. (PL-1). Received from COUNTER. Receipt #494605 for amount of $40.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.