Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Repercussions Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hayes, Terry, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 08, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,500 Or Less |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1206 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time1224 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2011 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 27, 2011 | Hearing | Order for Destruction/Disposal Civil Exhibits | |
April 29, 2010 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 15, 2008 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO TERRY HAYES DBA HAYES LANDSCAPING AND GARDENING |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO TERRY HAYES DBA HAYES LANDSCAPING AND GARDENING |
|
September 09, 2008 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
August 21, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF |
|
August 21, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAMES RAMAY APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. TERRY HAYES (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ALSO PRESENT: CYNTHIA HAYES. *************************************************************************************** THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: JAMES RAMAY. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.