Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Salim, Omar, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Wal-Mart Stores Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time980 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
June 23, 2008 | Hearing | Exhibit(s) Ordered Destroyed | |
January 10, 2008 | Hearing | Not Prop Disp Civil Case Exhibits | |
May 07, 2007 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice LETTER RE: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE/EMPLOYEE NOT ACTIVE, JUDGMENT FOR DEFT WALMART STORES INC. RECEIVED FROM AUTOMATIC DATA PROCESSING GARNISHMENT SERVICES |
|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice LETTER RE: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE/EMPLOYEE NOT ACTIVE, JUDGMENT FOR DEFT WALMART STORES INC. RECEIVED FROM AUTOMATIC DATA PROCESSING GARNISHMENT SERVICES |
|
April 25, 2007 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
April 24, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF |
|
April 24, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; HERETOFORE SUBMITTED ON 03/12/2007 THE COURT REACHES THE FOLLOWING DECISION: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF. |
|
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.