Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Don Roberto Jewelers Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hernandez, Araceli, Matozo, Jose Raul, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time3475 days |
Debtor's Examination
Date: November 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order- Debtor's Examination 11/2/15 Debtor's Examination As to Araceli Hernandez Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
November 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Debtor's Examination As to Araceli Hernandez Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
October 14, 2015 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
October 01, 2015 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
September 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Proof of Service PERSONAL SRV AS TO ARACELI HERNANDEZ |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONAL SRV AS TO ARACELI HERNANDEZ |
|
September 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination (Small Claims)As to Araceli Hernandez Hearing Date: 11/2/15 Hearing Time: 8:30am Department/Division:12 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination (Small Claims)As to Araceli Hernandez Hearing Date: 11/2/15 Hearing Time: 8:30am Department/Division:12 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Attachment for Defaulters / Bench Warrant Returned EXPIRED RETURNED BY KCSO |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Attachment for Defaulters / Bench Warrant Returned EXPIRED RETURNED BY KCSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.