Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lee-Rae Enterprises Inc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Mendez, Augustine, Mendez, Rose Marie, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time1307 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
November 14, 2008 | Hearing | Writ Returned Partially Satisfied | |
April 10, 2006 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for LEE-RAE ENTERPRISES INC DBA COLORTYME CASH (PL-1). Received from LEE-RAE ENTERPRISES, check no(s) 3208. Receipt #236163 for amount of $15.00. |
|
April 10, 2006 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued MAILED |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued MAILED |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for LEE-RAE ENTERPRISES INC DBA COLORTYME CASH (PL-1). Received from LEE-RAE ENTERPRISES, check no(s) 3208. Receipt #236163 for amount of $15.00. |
|
February 23, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $287.50; COSTS: $106.00, CANCELED CONTRACT & CHECK. |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $287.50; COSTS: $106.00, CANCELED CONTRACT & CHECK. |
|
February 21, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DOUGLAS CRIST APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS DOUGLAS CRIST DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR PRINCIPAL $287.50 COSTS TO BE DETERMINED, PLUS CANCELED CONTRACT & CHECK. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.