Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fastrip Financial Lp, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Trice, Tina, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time1307 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
February 22, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $323.00; COSTS: $0, CANCELED CHECK. |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $323.00; COSTS: $0, CANCELED CHECK. |
|
February 21, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RANDY STEED APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. TINA TRICE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. RANDY STEED DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $ 323.00 PLUS CANCELED CHECK. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $25.00 ON 3/3/2006, PAY $25.00 ON 03/08/2006 PAY $25.00 OR MORE ON THE EVERY TWO WEEKS UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $323.00. |
|
February 21, 2006 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
|
February 21, 2006 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Palmer, William D. |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RANDY STEED APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. TINA TRICE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. RANDY STEED DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $ 323.00 PLUS CANCELED CHECK. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $25.00 ON 3/3/2006, PAY $25.00 ON 03/08/2006 PAY $25.00 OR MORE ON THE EVERY TWO WEEKS UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $323.00. |
|
January 19, 2006 | Hearing |
Certified Mail Claimed CLAIMED AS TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.