Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fastrip Financial, L.P., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Dye, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time1707 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2010 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 21, 2010 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
July 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
October 04, 2007 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for FASTRIP FINANCIAL, L.P. (PL-1). Received from FASTRIP. Receipt #344194 for amount of $15.00. |
|
October 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/DKR |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/DKR |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for FASTRIP FINANCIAL, L.P. (PL-1). Received from FASTRIP. Receipt #344194 for amount of $15.00. |
|
September 24, 2007 | Hearing | Memo of Costs / Accrued Interest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.