Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mills, Tammie, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Yocum, James, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time1306 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
October 17, 2007 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for JONES, DWIGHT F JR DBA KERN JUDGMENT AND REVENUE RECOVERY (AS-1). Received from KERN JUDGMENT. Receipt #346813 for amount of $15.00. |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for JONES, DWIGHT F JR DBA KERN JUDGMENT AND REVENUE RECOVERY (AS-1). Received from KERN JUDGMENT. Receipt #346813 for amount of $15.00. |
|
October 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR |
|
September 24, 2007 | Hearing | Memo of Costs / Accrued Interest | |
September 20, 2007 | Hearing |
Assignment of Judgment ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY DWIGHT F. JONES |
|
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY DWIGHT F. JONES |
|
May 30, 2006 | Hearing | Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.