Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Short Melinda C, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Knight Juanita, Knight O B, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alderete, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2000 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2000 | Hearing | Entered on PHOENIX by NTM on 02/1/2000 Case: MELINDA C SHORT VS O B KNIGHT JUANITA KNIGHT , CS-148948 Judge PMA not found: S, 1500, CS, 148948, MELINDA C SHORT VS O B KNIGHT JUANITA KNIGHT, I, SM, P, 12/21/1999, , 0, , 0, PMA, , , 12/10/2006 5:47:10 PM, , 22843, | |
February 01, 2000 | Docket Event | Entered on PHOENIX by NTM on 02/1/2000 Case: MELINDA C SHORT VS O B KNIGHT JUANITA KNIGHT , CS-148948 Judge PMA not found: S, 1500, CS, 148948, MELINDA C SHORT VS O B KNIGHT JUANITA KNIGHT, I, SM, P, 12/21/1999, , 0, , 0, PMA, , , 12/10/2006 5:47:10 PM, , 22843, | |
January 31, 2000 | Hearing | Case DISPOSED in ENTIRETY. | |
January 31, 2000 | Hearing | Case DISPOSED before TRIAL - DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
January 31, 2000 | Hearing | Dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. | |
January 31, 2000 | Docket Event | Case DISPOSED before TRIAL - DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
January 31, 2000 | Docket Event | Dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. | |
January 31, 2000 | Docket Event | Case DISPOSED in ENTIRETY. | |
January 28, 2000 | Hearing | Appearance DROPPED for 01/31/2000 at: 08:30 AM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA Drop reason: NO SERVICE FILED | |
January 28, 2000 | Docket Event | Appearance DROPPED for 01/31/2000 at: 08:30 AM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA Drop reason: NO SERVICE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.