Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Springleaf Financial Services, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cramer, Todd L, against Urias, Fred, Urias, Fred A., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2015 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time167 days |
Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: September 10, 2015Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: August 27, 2015Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: September 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied County of Kern |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied County of Kern |
|
April 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE |
|
March 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE |
|
March 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Declaration for Default IN PAYMENTS UNDER INSTALLMENT JUDGMENT ORDER |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default IN PAYMENTS UNDER INSTALLMENT JUDGMENT ORDER |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE |
|
January 04, 2016 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) Hearing Entered. |
|
January 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.