Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Progressive West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Palomar, Edward, represented by Case, Anthony T, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category22-Cl >10K <25K Auto - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice |
|
August 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) dismissing cross-complaint filed by Edward I Palomar on 3/2/15 |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) dismissing cross-complaint filed by Edward I Palomar on 3/2/15 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Hearing | Notice of Ruling | |
June 30, 2015 | Hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
June 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
4153 Case Management Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
June 24, 2015 | Hearing | Case Management Statement of Defendant/Cross-Complainant EDWARD IVAN PALOMAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.