Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tgv, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evans, Chris J, against Barriga, Diana, Lozano, Gerardo, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2015 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal (UD) | |
May 06, 2015 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DIXON KUMMER MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR CHRIS J EVANS ON BEHALF OF TGV, LLC (PL-1). *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. |
|
May 06, 2015 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15 |
|
May 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DIXON KUMMER MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR CHRIS J EVANS ON BEHALF OF TGV, LLC (PL-1). *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15 |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF HEARING HEARING: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15 ______________________________________________________________________________________ To Counsel of record for respective parties: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE HEARING AS INDICATED ABOVE IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS SET FOR 5/6/2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING HEARING: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15 ______________________________________________________________________________________ To Counsel of record for respective parties: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE HEARING AS INDICATED ABOVE IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS SET FOR 5/6/2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. |
|
March 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated RE-SET AT TRIAL FOR 5/6 ~ calid=2749197 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:04/08/2015, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:1/5/2015 12:50:10 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.