Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tgv, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evans, Chris J, against Lewis, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
March 13, 2017 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs and Credits | |
December 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued Kern/Money/KJG |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued Kern/Money/KJG |
|
November 02, 2015 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
November 02, 2015 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs | |
April 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer **SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ETIENNE** |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer **SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ETIENNE** |
|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Declaration for Default JUDGMENT BY COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.