Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Able P.M. Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Sims, Ronald S, against Fell, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied Document Image |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied Document Image |
|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2745643 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:04/08/2015, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:12/26/2014 9:05:02 AM |
|
February 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA NEUMAN PARALEGAL |
|
February 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit Document Image |
|
February 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered Document Image |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2745643 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:04/08/2015, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:12/26/2014 9:05:02 AM |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA NEUMAN PARALEGAL |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit Document Image |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.