Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marilyn Larsen-Phillips, Trustee Of The Marilyn M Larsen Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Childers, Stephanie, against Brockman, Regi A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time107 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied Document Image |
|
April 09, 2015 | Hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for MARILYN LARSEN-PHILLIPS, TRUSTEE OF THE MARILYN... (PL-1). Received from STEPHANIE CHILDERS, check no(s) 1893. Receipt #832953 for amount of $25.00. |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for MARILYN LARSEN-PHILLIPS, TRUSTEE OF THE MARILYN... (PL-1). Received from STEPHANIE CHILDERS, check no(s) 1893. Receipt #832953 for amount of $25.00. |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied Document Image |
|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Abstract Issued RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY MESSENGER |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY MESSENGER |
|
April 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs STEPHANIE R CHILDERS ESQ |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs STEPHANIE R CHILDERS ESQ |
|
March 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY MESSENGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.