Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Harring, David, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Martens, Christopher, represented by Swanson, Jeremy D, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
Category06-Cl >10K <25K Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: January 09, 2019Ruling
Date: January 27, 2017Order Denying Motion
Date: May 16, 2019Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: June 18, 2019Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 09, 2019Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: January 02, 2018Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: July 16, 2019Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)
Date: July 16, 2019Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 14, 2019Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 14, 2019Motion to Vacate (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 14, 2019Motion for New Trial
Date: February 13, 2020Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: October 22, 2019Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: October 25, 2016Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: September 28, 2015Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: September 19, 2016Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: January 09, 2020Motion for New Trial
Date: January 07, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: May 28, 2015Ruling
Date: February 04, 2019Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: February 25, 2019Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: September 02, 2020Motion (Post-Disposition)
Date: July 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (Post-Disposition) 09/02/2020 Motion (Post-Disposition) Filed by Tammy Harring , Intervenor- PL. Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene and for the Court to Vacate its 2/13/2020 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 02, 2020 | Hearing |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. The official record of court proceedings is provided by the court reporter. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
September 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion (Post-Disposition) Filed by Tammy Harring , Intervenor- PL. Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene and for the Court to Vacate its 2/13/2020 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. The official record of court proceedings is provided by the court reporter. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet courtcall confirmed as to David Harring for proceedings on 9/2/20 |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet courtcall confirmed as to David Harring for proceedings on 9/2/20 |
|
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Opposition to Motion to Vacate 2-13-2020 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Vacate 2-13-2020 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial |
|
July 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE Hearing Date: 9/2/20 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division: 12 |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Re: MOTION TO INTERVENE Hearing Date: 9/2/20 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division: 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.