Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Turner, Hazel Mae, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bakersfield Mazda, represented by Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2014 |
Category06-Cl >10K <25K Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time595 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Proof of Service Motion to reopen court case. |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Motion to reopen court case. |
|
August 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 8/5/2014, in Department 12, before the Honorable LINDA S ETIENNE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LINDA S ETIENNE Commissioner of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 8/5/2014, in Department 12, before the Honorable LINDA S ETIENNE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LINDA S ETIENNE Commissioner of the Superior Court |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 8/5/2014, in Department 12, before the Honorable LINDA S ETIENNE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LINDA S ETIENNE Commissioner of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 8/5/2014, in Department 12, before the Honorable LINDA S ETIENNE, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LINDA S ETIENNE Commissioner of the Superior Court |
|
August 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 19, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated CASE DISMISSED ~ calid=2484248 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:08/25/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:CCM, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:2/21/2014 10:50:51 AM |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated CASE DISMISSED ~ calid=2484248 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:08/25/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:CCM, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:2/21/2014 10:50:51 AM |
|
August 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs TOTAL COSTS $576.00 |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs TOTAL COSTS $576.00 |
|
August 05, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CRC 3.110 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY HADI-TY S KHARAZI ON BEHALF OF BAKERSFIELD MAZDA (DE-1). *************************************************************************************** THE COURT FINDS AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS NEVER FILED WITH THE COURT. CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.