Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Macdowell, Todd, against Dean, Rechima J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2014 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions189 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2338 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied County of Kern from 3/1/17 |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied County of Kern from 3/1/17 |
|
November 28, 2018 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction of Judgment | |
August 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption certified copy sent to Kern County Sheriff Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption certified copy sent to Kern County Sheriff Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Claim of Exemption As to Rechima Dean Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Claim of Exemption As to Rechima Dean Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption As to Rechima Dean |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption As to Rechima Dean |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.