Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Hyman, Suzanne R, represented by Kavanagh, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2013 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time394 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ANDREW BRISENO MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CRC 3.740(F) |
|
April 02, 2014 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal CRC 3.740(F) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ANDREW BRISENO MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal CRC 3.740(F) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CRC 3.740(F) |
|
March 03, 2014 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 21, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF MODIFICATION OF STAY FILED ON DECEMBER 16, 2013 BY PATRICK KAVANAGH, ESQ. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT FINDS AND ORDERS THE FOLLOWING: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.740(F), TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE SET FOR 04/02/2014 AT 08:30A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 12 BEFORE THE HONORABLE COMMISSIONER LINDA S. ETIENNE. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.