Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bhangu, Sandeep, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Clark, Sheila, Marquez, Victorio, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Schuett, Stephen D. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2011 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2012 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered RETURNED FROM VICTORIO MARQUEZ - ENCLOSED: JUDGMENT BY COURT |
|
February 03, 2012 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered RETURNED FROM SHEILA CLARK - ENCLOSED: JUDGMENT BY COURT |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered RETURNED FROM SHEILA CLARK - ENCLOSED: JUDGMENT BY COURT |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered RETURNED FROM VICTORIO MARQUEZ - ENCLOSED: JUDGMENT BY COURT |
|
January 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
January 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA EFFECTIVE PROPERTY |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA EFFECTIVE PROPERTY |
|
January 19, 2012 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR: SANDEEP BHANGU JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHEILA CLARK & VICTORIO MARQUEZ RENT/DAMAGES: $2023.19 ATTORNEY FEES: $0 COSTS: $ 320.00 LATE FEES: $0 INTEREST: $0 TOTAL: $2343.19 *******SIGNED BY JUDGE SCHUETT******** JUDGMENT MAILED: 1/24/12 |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR: SANDEEP BHANGU JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHEILA CLARK & VICTORIO MARQUEZ RENT/DAMAGES: $2023.19 ATTORNEY FEES: $0 COSTS: $ 320.00 LATE FEES: $0 INTEREST: $0 TOTAL: $2343.19 *******SIGNED BY JUDGE SCHUETT******** JUDGMENT MAILED: 1/24/12 |
|
December 12, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: SANDEEP BHANGU (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANTS, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $2023.19, COSTS $320.00, ATTORNEY FEES $-0-, MISC FEES $-0- FOR A TOTAL OF $2343.19. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. THE COURT TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.