Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ramos Strong, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Montague, Vanessa, against Escobar, Oscar E, Sr., Escobar, Oscar E, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
Category06-Cl >10K <25K Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2011 | Hearing |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for RAMOS/STRONG, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from MONTAGUE & VILGIONE, check no(s) 13169. Receipt #625835 for amount of $25.00. |
|
December 02, 2011 | Hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for RAMOS/STRONG, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from MONTAGUE & VILGIONE, check no(s) 13170. Receipt #625834 for amount of $25.00. |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for RAMOS/STRONG, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from MONTAGUE & VILGIONE, check no(s) 13170. Receipt #625834 for amount of $25.00. |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for RAMOS/STRONG, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from MONTAGUE & VILGIONE, check no(s) 13169. Receipt #625835 for amount of $25.00. |
|
October 31, 2011 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
October 17, 2011 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN: KERN TOTAL: $6095.61 |
|
October 17, 2011 | Hearing |
Abstract Issued TOTAL: $6070.61 |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued TOTAL: $6070.61 |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued KERN: KERN TOTAL: $6095.61 |
|
October 06, 2011 | Hearing | HEARING VACATED/COURT JUDGT ENTERED ~ calid=1587182 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4156, CourtDate:10/31/2011, Courtroom:14, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:LSE, Deputy:angelm, SystemDate:5/13/2011 11:48:12 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.