Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Castillo, Maria, represented by Revelo, J Arturo, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
Category09-Cl <10K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time361 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 15, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2011 | Hearing |
NP4170 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARK D WALSH ON BEHALF OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT OR COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. |
|
June 08, 2011 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. |
|
June 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Hearing Entered. |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP4170 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARK D WALSH ON BEHALF OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT OR COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. |
|
April 05, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1821 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 01/11/11 BY J. ARTURO REVELO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** PARTIES ARE TO COMPLY WITH CRC RULE 3.650. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OR IMPOSITION OF OTHER SANCTIONS ON PARTY/COUNSEL FILING THE NOTICE OF STAY, OR IF PARTY FILING THE NOTICE OF STAY HAS NOT APPEARED, ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS SET FOR 06/08/11 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WILL BE VACATED IF CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS IS FILED NOT LESS THAN 5 DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING. THE HEARING SET FOR 06/15/11 & 12/06/11 ARE HEREBY VACATED. |
|
April 05, 2011 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated NOTICE OF STAY FILED. ~ calid=1457834 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:12/06/2011, Courtroom:14, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:adrianac, SystemDate:12/22/2010 3:37:47 PM |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 01/11/11 BY J. ARTURO REVELO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** PARTIES ARE TO COMPLY WITH CRC RULE 3.650. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OR IMPOSITION OF OTHER SANCTIONS ON PARTY/COUNSEL FILING THE NOTICE OF STAY, OR IF PARTY FILING THE NOTICE OF STAY HAS NOT APPEARED, ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS SET FOR 06/08/11 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WILL BE VACATED IF CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS IS FILED NOT LESS THAN 5 DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING. THE HEARING SET FOR 06/15/11 & 12/06/11 ARE HEREBY VACATED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.